EP3766945 - FUEL PROCESSING SYSTEM FOR SULFUR BEARING FUELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battelle Memorial Institute 505 King Avenue Columbus, OH 43201-2969 / US | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGE, Paul E. 2198 Powell Road Powell, Ohio 43065 / US | 02 /
CONTINI, Vincent J. 3007 Jamestown Drive Powell, Ohio 43065 / US | 03 /
WHYATT, Greg A. 3401 Equestrian Drive West Richland, Washington 99353 / US | 04 /
THORNTON, Douglas A. 1770 Harwitch Road Columbus, Ohio 43221 / US | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20188331.1 | 13.10.2011 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | US201039269810P | 13.10.2010 Original published format: US 39269810 P | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3766945 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C10G67/06, C10G45/02, C10G49/00, H01M8/06 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C10G67/06 (EP,US);
B01J8/04 (US);
B01J8/0496 (US);
C10G25/003 (EP,US);
C10G45/02 (EP,US);
C10G49/007 (EP,US);
H01M8/0618 (EP,US);
H01M8/0675 (EP,US);
H01M8/0687 (US);
B01J2208/00504 (US);
C01B2203/0233 (US);
C01B2203/0405 (US);
C01B2203/065 (US);
C01B2203/066 (US);
C01B2203/0811 (US);
C01B2203/0822 (US);
C01B2203/0827 (US);
C01B2203/127 (US);
C10G2300/104 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1044 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1051 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1055 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/207 (EP,US);
C10G2400/02 (EP,US);
C10G2400/04 (EP,US);
C10G2400/08 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SCHWEFELHALTIGE BRENNSTOFFE | [2021/03] | English: | FUEL PROCESSING SYSTEM FOR SULFUR BEARING FUELS | [2021/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE CARBURANT SULFURÉ | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 06.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 30.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11779012.1 / EP2627738 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5130115 (FUJISOU TOKUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9 * column 2, line 44; figure 2; example 2 * * column 5, line 24 - line 58 * [I] 2,7,8,10-14; | [A]US3476534 (BUSWELL RICHARD F, et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claim 4 *; | [A]WO2009123585 (UTC POWER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US2003064259 (GITTLEMAN CRAIG S [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *; | [AD]US2009035622 (KING DAVID L [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * figure 1; claims 1,6 *; | [A]JP2002356308 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0034] , [0035]; figure 3 * | by applicant | US2009035622 | US20080595203 | US20080182640 |