EP3772452 - PEDALING SENSING DEVICE OF ELECTRIC BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unique Product & Design Co., Ltd. No.5, Ming Dong Road Yong Kang District Tainan City 710 / TW | [2021/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Chih-Ching No.5, Mindong Rd., Yongkang Dist. 710 Tainan City / TW | [2021/06] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/06] | Application number, filing date | 20188373.3 | 29.07.2020 | [2021/06] | Priority number, date | TW20190210360U | 06.08.2019 Original published format: TW 108210360 U | [2021/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3772452 | Date: | 10.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3772452 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62M6/50, B62M6/55, G01L1/04, G01L1/12, G01L3/14, G01L3/10, B62J45/411, B62J45/421 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
B62M6/50 (EP,US);
B62J45/41 (US);
B62J45/411 (EP);
B62J45/421 (EP);
B62M6/55 (EP,US);
B62M6/60 (US);
G01L1/044 (EP);
G01L1/122 (EP);
G01L3/101 (EP,US);
G01L3/1464 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/06] | B62M6/50, B62M6/55, G01L1/04, G01L1/12, G01L3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] |
Former [2021/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRETMESSVORRICHTUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN FAHRRADS | [2021/06] | English: | PEDALING SENSING DEVICE OF ELECTRIC BICYCLE | [2021/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE PÉDALAGE DE BICYCLETTE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 04.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000142545 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-15* figures 8,9 *; | [XAI]CN206049955U (NEW ANANDA DRIVE TECHNIQUES (SHANGHAI) CO LTD) [X] 1-6,9,10,12 * figures 1-4 * [A] 7,8,11 [I] 13-15; | [XAI]CN206691312U (NEW ANANDA DRIVE TECHNIQUES SHANGHAI CO LTD) [X] 1-6,9,10,12,13 * figures 1-4 * [A] 7,8,11 [I] 14,15; | [A]CN108639225 (FOSHAN NANHAI KANGMING VEHICLE IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5 * |