EP3866514 - NETWORK REGISTRATION OF TERMINAL, AND METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR TRANSMISSION OF NETWORK SELECTION PARAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Daliang No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 20188430.1 | 29.07.2020 | [2021/33] | Priority number, date | CN20201089323 | 12.02.2020 Original published format: CN202010089323 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866514 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,CN);
H04W48/16 (CN);
H04W60/00 (CN,US);
H04W4/029 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2021/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NETZREGISTRIERUNG VON ENDGERÄTEN SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON NETZAUSWAHLPARAMETERN | [2021/33] | English: | NETWORK REGISTRATION OF TERMINAL, AND METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR TRANSMISSION OF NETWORK SELECTION PARAMETER | [2021/33] | French: | ENREGISTREMENT DE RÉSEAU DE TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE TRANSMISSION DE PARAMÈTRE DE SÉLECTION DE RÉSEAU | [2021/33] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 09.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2017114326 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,7-11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0125]; figures 1-5 * [I] 4-6,12-14; | [XAI]US2017222901 (JAIN ARVIND [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0077]; figure 5 * * figures 9,10 * [A] 7,15[I] 4-6,12-14 |