02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
15.12.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
08.12.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.12.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.12.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.09.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.09.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
01.09.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
24.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.08.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
06.08.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
04.08.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.01.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.02.2021 [2021/05] |
04.08.2020 |
Change - representative |
|