EP3771553 - DYEING APPARATUS AND DYEING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nidek Co., Ltd. 34-14, Maehama Hiroishi-cho Gamagori-shi Aichi, 443-0038 / JP | For all designated states Shizuoka Prefecture 9-6, Ote-machi Aoi-ku Shizuoka / JP | [2023/43] |
Former [2021/05] | For all designated states Nidek Co., Ltd. 34-14, Maehama Hiroishi-cho Gamagori-shi Aichi, 443-0038 / JP | ||
For all designated states Shizuoka Prefecture 9-6 Ohtemachi Aoi-ku Shizuoka-city Shizuoka 420-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INUZUKA, Minoru c/o NIDEK CO., LTD., 34-14, Maehama, Hiroishi-cho Gamagori, Aichi / JP | 02 /
ABE, Koji c/o NIDEK CO., LTD., 34-14, Maehama, Hiroishi-cho Gamagori, Aichi / JP | 03 /
SHIBATA, Ryoji c/o NIDEK CO., LTD., 34-14, Maehama, Hiroishi-cho Gamagori, Aichi / JP | 04 /
SHIBAMOTO, Takahisa c/o NIDEK CO., LTD., 34-14, Maehama, Hiroishi-cho Gamagori, Aichi / JP | 05 /
UETA, Hiroyasu c/o Industrial Research Institute of Shizuoka Prefecture Hamamatsu Technical Support Center 1-3-3, Shinmiyakoda, Kita-ku Hamamatsu, Shizuoka / JP | 06 /
NAGATSU, Yoshiyuki c/o Industrial Research Institute of Shizuoka Prefecture Hamamatsu Technical Support Center 1-3-3, Shinmiyakoda, Kita-ku Hamamatsu, Shizuoka / JP | [2021/05] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2021/05] | Application number, filing date | 20188556.3 | 30.07.2020 | [2021/05] | Priority number, date | JP20190140233 | 30.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019140233 | [2021/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3771553 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3771553 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, D06P5/20, D06P5/28, D06P5/00, B23K26/03, B23K26/082 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
B29D11/00951 (EP);
D06B19/0005 (CN);
B29D11/00009 (EP);
B29D11/00903 (EP);
D06P5/004 (EP);
D06P5/2005 (EP);
D06P5/2077 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/05] | B29D11/00, B23K26/03, B23K26/082, D06P5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] |
Former [2021/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FÄRBEVORRICHTUNG UND FÄRBEVERFAHREN | [2021/05] | English: | DYEING APPARATUS AND DYEING METHOD | [2021/05] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TEINTURE | [2021/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 02.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 17.01.2024 | |
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 17.01.2024 | |
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 17.04.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 17.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011018175 (INUZUKA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0020] - [0029] *[A] 2-6,8-12; | [X]US2018127918 (INUZUKA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0046] *; | [X]JP2018127722 (NIDEK KK, et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] - [0033] - [0035] - [0037] - [0040] - [0043] - [0063] * | by applicant | JP2001215306 | JP2013015824 |