EP3945641 - POWER SOCKET HAVING A BASE PART, AN AESTHETIC COVER, AND A DRIVE MEMBER FOR A MOVABLE COVER OF THE AESTHETIC COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berker GmbH & Co. KG Klagebach 38 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2022/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIROTTO, Marco 25080 Calvagese Della Riviera (BS) / IT | 02 /
GATTO, Davide 25017 Lonato Del Garda (BS) / IT | 03 /
MASSAGRANDE, Antonio 25082 Botticino (BS) / IT | [2022/05] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [2022/05] | Application number, filing date | 20188680.1 | 30.07.2020 | [2022/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3945641 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/447, H01R13/453, // H01R24/78, H01R105/00 | [2022/05] | CPC: |
H01R13/447 (EP);
H01R13/4538 (EP);
H01R2105/00 (EP);
H01R24/78 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] |
Former [2022/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKDOSE MIT EINEM BASISTEIL, EINER ÄSTHETISCHEN ABDECKUNG UND EINEM ANTRIEBSELEMENT FÜR EINE BEWEGLICHE ABDECKUNG DER ÄSTHETISCHEN ABDECKUNG | [2022/05] | English: | POWER SOCKET HAVING A BASE PART, AN AESTHETIC COVER, AND A DRIVE MEMBER FOR A MOVABLE COVER OF THE AESTHETIC COVER | [2022/05] | French: | PRISE ÉLECTRIQUE DOTÉE D'UNE PARTIE DE BASE, UN COUVERCLE ESTHÉTIQUE ET UN ÉLÉMENT D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UN COUVERCLE AMOVIBLE DU COUVERCLE ESTHÉTIQUE | [2022/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 29.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2555336 (LEGRAND FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12,13,15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0134]; figures 1,2,6,7,8,9 * [I] 4,11,14; | [A]EP3352308 (BERKER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |