EP3772078 - AN ELECTRODE FOR A CIRCUIT BREAKER AND THE CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Electrical Ltd. Lou Yang Rd. 2 Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou / CN | [2023/18] |
Former [2021/05] | For all designated states Eaton Electrical Ltd. Lou Yang Rd. 2 Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Shunfeng No. 2 Louyang Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215121 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Hui No. 2 Louyang Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215121 / CN | 03 /
LI, Zuhui No. 2 Louyang Road Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215121 / CN | [2021/05] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [2023/18] |
Former [2021/05] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20188715.5 | 30.07.2020 | [2021/05] | Priority number, date | CN201921211364U | 30.07.2019 Original published format: CN 201921211364 U | [2021/05] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3772078 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3772078 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/44, H01H9/34, // H01H1/20, H01H9/30 | [2021/05] | CPC: |
H01H9/443 (EP);
H01H33/42 (US);
H01H33/59 (US);
H01H9/346 (EP);
H02H3/087 (US);
H01H1/2041 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/05] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE FÜR EINEN SCHUTZSCHALTER UND SCHUTZSCHALTER | [2021/05] | English: | AN ELECTRODE FOR A CIRCUIT BREAKER AND THE CIRCUIT BREAKER | [2021/05] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POUR DISJONCTEUR ET DISJONCTEUR | [2021/05] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/05] | 28.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | IE | 30.07.2023 | LU | 30.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 31.07.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | DE | 01.02.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 30.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 30.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
DE | 01.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 30.07.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2013284702 (HAMADA YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8-11 * paragraphs [0039] - [0056] * * figures 1-9 * [A] 3-5,7; | [XA]US2015243458 (BRITZ AXEL [DE]) [X] 1,8-11 * paragraphs [0026] - [0032] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 2-7; | [XA]EP3144950 (GORLAN TEAM SLU [ES]) [X] 1,8,9,11 * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] * * figures 1-4 *[A] 3; | [XA]EP3384512 (EATON INTELLIGENT POWER LTD [IE]) [X] 1,2,6,8-11 * paragraphs [0015] - [0028] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 3-5,7 | Examination | EP3384512 |