EP3750496 - TENDON RETENTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paragon 28, Inc. 4B Inverness Court E. Suite 280 Englewood, Colorado 80112 / US | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLACKLIDGE, Douglas K. 9567 Pleasant View Lane Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | [2020/52] |
Former [2020/51] | 01 /
BLACKLIDGE, Douglas K. 11230 Aviemore Court Zionsville, IN 46077 / US | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emmanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | De Bonis, Paolo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 20188752.8 | 26.08.2017 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | US201662379789P | 26.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662379789 P | US201762454100P | 03.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762454100 P | US201762500574P | 03.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762500574 P | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750496 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3750496 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/68, A61F2/08 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
A61F2/0811 (EP,US);
A61B17/683 (EP,US);
A61B17/7291 (US);
A61B2017/564 (US);
A61B2017/681 (US);
A61F2002/0823 (US);
A61F2002/0829 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0841 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0858 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] |
Former [2020/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SEHNENHALTEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/51] | English: | TENDON RETENTION DEVICE | [2020/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN DE TENDON | [2020/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17765303.7 / EP3503828 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5707373 (SEVRAIN LIONEL C [FR], et al); | [X]US5893850 (CACHIA VICTOR V [US]); | [X]US6302887 (SPRANZA JOSEPH JOHN [US], et al); | [X]US2002055743 (SEEMANN MICHAEL [DE]); | [X]US2005240188 (CHOW DAVID [US], et al); | [X]FR2928824 (TEKKA SA [FR]); | [X]US2011137356 (KOLLMER CHARLES [US]); | [X]US2014222087 (GREENBERG LOUIS E [US], et al) |