EP3832920 - RANDOM-ACCESS PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHLIN, Henrik Kalkstensvägen 1 SE-435 41 MÖLNLYCKE / SE | 02 /
BALDEMAIR, Robert Honnörsgatan 16 SE-170 69 SOLNA / SE | 03 /
PARKVALL, Stefan Hermelinstigen 24 SE-167 57 BROMMA / SE | 04 /
DAHLMAN, Erik Scheelegatan 3 SE-112 23 STOCKHOLM / SE | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 20189058.9 | 08.11.2017 | [2021/23] | Priority number, date | US201662421005P | 11.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662421005 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832920 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04W76/14, H04L5/00, H04L27/00 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
H04L1/0003 (EP,RU,US);
H04L27/0012 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04W74/006 (KR,RU,US);
H04L1/0005 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0041 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (KR,US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] |
Former [2021/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RANDOM-ACCESS PROZEDUR | [2021/23] | English: | RANDOM-ACCESS PROCEDURE | [2021/23] | French: | PROCEDURE D'ACCES ALEATOIRE | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 09.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17804469.9 / EP3398277 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010034152 (IMAMURA KIMIHIKO [US]); | [E]WO2018081385 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [E]WO2018085701 (INTEL IP CORP [US]); | [E]EP3537677 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) |