Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3906803 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3906803



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(48)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 135
23.09.2022 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.06.2022 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
15.11.2021 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.11.2021 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.10.2021 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.05.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.05.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.05.2021 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 28
16.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.03.2021 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
16.03.2021 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
16.03.2021 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
16.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.03.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.03.2021 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.03.2021 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
15.03.2021 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
15.03.2021 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
15.03.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.02.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2021 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 6
08.02.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 4
08.02.2021 European search report Search / examination 2
08.02.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
02.02.2021 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
13.01.2021 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.01.2021 Search started Search / examination 1
11.01.2021 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.01.2021 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
23.12.2020 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
21.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2020 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 6
21.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.12.2020 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 1
09.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.12.2020 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 6
09.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.12.2020 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 1
25.09.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.08.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.08.2020 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.08.2020 Claims Search / examination 2
03.08.2020 Description Search / examination 5
03.08.2020 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.08.2020 Drawings Search / examination 3
03.08.2020 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5