EP3763717 - PYRIDO[4,3-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ONE COMPOUNDS AS MUTANT IDH1 AND IDH2 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/02] | PYRIDO[4,3-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ONE AND PYRIMIDO[4,5-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ONE COMPOUNDS AS MUTANT IDH1 AND IDH2 INHIBITORS | ||
[2021/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND CO. Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Renato Alejandro c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 02 /
BOULET, Serge Louis c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 03 /
BURKHOLDER, Timothy Paul c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 04 /
GILMOUR, Raymond c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 05 /
HAHN, Patric James c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | 06 /
RANKOVIC, Zoran c/o Eli Lilly and Company P.O. Box 6288 Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-6288 / US | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Ingham, Stephen Howard Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 20189241.1 | 08.12.2017 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | US201662435283P | 16.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662435283 P | [2021/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763717 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3763717 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04, A61P35/00, A61K31/5365 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
C07D498/04 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,EA,IL,KR);
A61K31/5365 (IL,KR);
A61P35/02 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] |
Former [2021/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 13.07.2021 | ME | 13.07.2021 | Validation states | MA | 13.07.2021 | MD | 13.07.2021 | Title | German: | PYRIDO[4,3-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ON-DERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN DER MUTIERTEN IDH1 UND IDH2 PROTEINE | [2021/46] | English: | PYRIDO[4,3-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ONE COMPOUNDS AS MUTANT IDH1 AND IDH2 INHIBITORS | [2021/46] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIDO[4,3-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ONE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA FORME MUTÉE DES PROTÉINES IDH1 ET IDH2 | [2021/46] |
Former [2021/02] | PYRIDO[4,3-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ON- UND PYRIMIDO[4,5-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ON-DERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN DER MUTIERTEN IDH1 UND IDH2 PROTEINE | ||
Former [2021/02] | PYRIDO[4,3-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ONE AND PYRIMIDO[4,5-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ONE COMPOUNDS AS MUTANT IDH1 AND IDH2 INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2021/02] | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIDO[4,3-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ONE ET DE PYRIMIDO[4,5-D][1,3]OXAZIN-2-ONE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA FORME MUTÉE DES PROTÉINES IDH1 ET IDH2 | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17822882.1 / EP3555105 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | LU | 08.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 08.03.2023 | |
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013046136 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2016171755 (FORMA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | [ADP]WO2017019429 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) | by applicant | WO2016US43264 |