EP3754941 - DATA STORAGE METHODS FOR A BLOCKCHAIN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/52] | BLOCKCHAIN SYSTEM AND DATA STORAGE METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
[2021/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced New Technologies Co., Ltd. Cayman Corporate Centre 27 Hospital Road George Town, Grand Cayman KY1-9008 / KY | [2021/02] |
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LIMITED Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Ning Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F Building 3 No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Branderhorst, Matthijs Pieter Arie Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Branderhorst, Matthijs Pieter Arie Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 20189466.4 | 12.02.2018 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | CN20171086153 | 17.02.2017 Original published format: CN201710086153 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754941 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3754941 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L9/32, G06F21/64 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,RU);
H04L63/12 (CN,KR,RU);
H04L9/0643 (US);
G06F16/22 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L63/123 (EP);
H04L67/10 (CN,KR);
H04L67/1095 (EP,US);
H04L67/60 (CN,KR);
H04L67/63 (EP);
H04L9/0637 (US);
H04L9/3236 (US);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | DATENSPEICHERVERFAHREN FÜR EIN BLOCKKETTENSYSTEM | [2021/39] | English: | DATA STORAGE METHODS FOR A BLOCKCHAIN SYSTEM | [2021/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE MÉMORISATION DE DONNÉES POUR UN SYSTÈME DE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS | [2021/39] |
Former [2020/52] | BLOCKKETTENSYSTEM UND DATENSPEICHERVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2020/52] | BLOCKCHAIN SYSTEM AND DATA STORAGE METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
Former [2020/52] | SYSTÈME DE CHAÎNE DE BLOCS ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MÉMORISATION DE DONNÉES | Examination procedure | 04.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 11.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18754500.9 / EP3562120 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/44] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2016224949 (THOMAS STEFAN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0080] * * figures 5, 7 * [A] 7-12; | [A] - Bitfury Group ET AL, "Public versus Private Blockchains", (20151020), URL: http://bitfury.com/content/5-white-papers-research/public-vs-private-pt1-1.pdf, (20170613), XP055381268 [A] 1-15 * 2 Blockchain Technology * * 2.2 Access to Blockchain Data * |