EP3772560 - DEVICE FOR SECURING A CONSTRUCTION ACCESSORY WITH A CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT AND ASSOCIATED CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KP1 91 Allée des Fenaisons 84000 Avignon / FR | [2022/36] |
Former [2021/06] | For all designated states KP1 135, Avenue Pierre Semard, MIN Bâtiment D 84000 Avignon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRIC, Laurent 13 Chemin des Eycellets 30150 Montfaucon / FR | 02 /
GARCIA, Richard 18 Allée de la Pause 30650 Rochefort du Gard / FR | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/06] | 01 /
ABRIC, Laurent 13 Chemin des Eycellets 30150 MONFAUCON / FR | ||
02 /
GARCIA, Richard 18 Allée de la Pause 30650 ROCHEFORT DU GARD / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Boettcher, et al 5, rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/06] | Decorchemont, Audrey Véronique Christèle, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20189978.8 | 07.08.2020 | [2021/06] | Priority number, date | FR20190009086 | 08.08.2019 Original published format: FR 1909086 | [2021/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3772560 | Date: | 10.02.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3772560 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04G15/06, E04G21/18, E04B1/18, E04C2/00, E04B5/17, E04C3/293, E04G21/32, E04G15/04, E04B5/38 | [2021/06] | CPC: |
E04G21/185 (EP);
E04C5/16 (EP);
E04G15/04 (EP);
E04G15/061 (EP);
E04B5/38 (EP);
E04G21/3223 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] |
Former [2021/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES BAUZUBEHÖRTEILS AN EINEM BAUELEMENT, UND ENTSPRECHENDES BAUELEMENT | [2021/06] | English: | DEVICE FOR SECURING A CONSTRUCTION ACCESSORY WITH A CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT AND ASSOCIATED CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT | [2021/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOLIDARISATION D'UN ACCESSOIRE DE CONSTRUCTION À UN ÉLÉMENT DE CONSTRUCTION ET ÉLÉMENT DE CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIÉ | [2021/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 09.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20030069756 (LIM JONG WAN [KR]) [X] 1-5,7-11,13-18 * figures 10a, 10b, 10c *[I] 6,12; | [XI]EP1965005 (KP1 [FR]) [X] 1-7,9-14,18 * figures 1-3 * * claim 1 * [I] 8,15-17 |