EP3796269 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONTINOUSLY TRACKING AT LEAST ONE COMPETITOR ON AN ATHLETICS TRACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swiss Timing Ltd Rue de l'Envers 1 2606 Corgémont / CH | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEISSNER, Andreas Herlosssohnstrasse 7 04155 Leipzig / DE | 02 /
VOELKER, Christian Lange Strasse 18a 06686 Luetzen-Kreischau / DE | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 20190001.6 | 07.08.2020 | [2021/12] | Priority number, date | EP20190197982 | 18.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19197982 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796269 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3796269 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G07C1/12, G07C1/24, G01S5/14, // G01S1/20, G01S5/02, A63B71/02, H04N21/81 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G07C1/12 (EP);
A63B24/0021 (US);
G01S13/765 (EP);
G01S13/878 (EP);
G01S13/88 (EP);
G01S19/48 (US);
G01S5/14 (EP);
G07C1/24 (EP);
A63B2024/0025 (US);
A63B2220/31 (US);
A63B2220/40 (US);
A63B2220/836 (US);
A63B2225/50 (US);
G01S13/867 (EP);
G01S2205/08 (EP);
G01S2205/09 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN VERFOLGUNG VON MINDESTENS EINEM KONKURRENTEN AUF EINER LAUFSPUR | [2021/12] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONTINOUSLY TRACKING AT LEAST ONE COMPETITOR ON AN ATHLETICS TRACK | [2021/12] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUIVI CONTINU D'AU MOINS UN CONCURRENT SUR UNE PISTE D'ATHLÉTISME | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 24.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2472288 (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0425] - paragraph [0433] ** figure 107 *; | [I]US2014364973 (O'HAGAN JAMES J [US], et al) [I] 1-5,9-13,15 * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0165] * * paragraph [0225] - paragraph [0226] * * paragraph [0343] *; | [I]US2015375083 (STELFOX JILL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0178] - paragraph [0180] * * paragraph [0238] - paragraph [0250] * * figures 1,10,11 * | by applicant | US2014169140 |