Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.06.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
12.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
01.03.2024 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
14.06.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.06.2023 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
14.11.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
05.07.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.07.2022 | First examination report | |
17.06.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.08.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
27.08.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
27.08.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.01.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
08.08.2020 | Change - representative |