EP3758076 - LIGHT EMITTING DIODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. 65-12, Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu, Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 00000 / KR | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoon, Yeo Jin 1B-36, 727-5, Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu, Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Seo, Won Cheol 1B-36, 727-5, Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu, Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/16] |
Former [2021/01] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20190306.9 | 23.11.2010 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | KR20090131693 | 28.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090131693 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758076 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3758076 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/38, H01L33/46 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
H01L33/46 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/385 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/42 (US);
H01L33/405 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE DIODE | [2021/01] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING DIODE | [2021/01] | French: | DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10192249.0 / EP2339654 | Divisional application(s) | EP23168470.5 / EP4220743 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | LU | 23.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
PT | 21.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1256987 (LUMILEDS LIGHTING LLC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * Table 1;; figure 3B *; | [A]US2006169994 (TU CHUAN-CHENG [TW], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0019] , [0023] - [0024]; figure 1D *; | [Y]US2007145380 (SHUM FRANK T [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0128] - [0129]; figure 13A *; | [Y]US2008303047 (SHEN CHIEN-FU [TW], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figure 1D *; | [A]WO2009020365 (KOREA PHOTONICS TECH INST [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 19 *; | [A]US2009108250 (KIM HWA MOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-13* figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2009114935 (HUANG CHEN-YANG [TW], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0038]; figures 2,7 *; | [Y]TW200921936 (IND TECH RES INST [TW], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2009125953 (SONG JUNE O [KR]) [A] 1-13 * figure 10 *; | US2011180831 [ ] (SONG JUNE O [KR]) [ ] * figure 10 * |