EP3782664 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING BLOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yapici, Ahmet Arapsuyu, Belediye Caddesi 32/3 07070 Konyaaltý/Antalya / TR | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltzkanzlei Hutzelmann Schloß Osterberg 89296 Osterberg / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 20190367.1 | 10.08.2020 | [2021/08] | Priority number, date | DE201910121614 | 11.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019121614 | [2021/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782664 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/02, A61M1/36, B01L3/00 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
A61M1/029 (EP);
A61M1/0272 (EP);
B01L3/502 (EP);
B01L2300/048 (EP);
B01L2400/0478 (EP);
B01L3/5021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] |
Former [2021/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SEPARIEREN VON BLUT | [2021/08] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING BLOOD | [2021/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DU SANG | [2021/08] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 07.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1385576 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE) [X] 1,2,6-9,11-14* the whole document *; | [X]EP2495302 (TOZAIHOLDINGS INC [KR]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US2014371048 (RA JEONG CHAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US2015104824 (WALKER TRENTON [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-16 * the whole document *; | [X]AU2013312546 (YANG CHAOCHENG) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * |