EP3955080 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SOCIALLY AWARE MODEL PREDICTIVE CONTROL OF A ROBOTIC DEVICE USING MACHINE LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palmieri, Luigi 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Rudenko, Andrey 70499 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Arras, Kai Oliver 70180 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20190604.7 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3955080 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3955080 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G06N3/08, G05B17/02, G05B13/04, G01C21/34, B25J9/16, G06N3/045 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
G05D1/0217 (EP);
G05D1/0221 (CN,US);
B25J9/1605 (US);
B25J9/1664 (EP,US);
B25J9/1666 (US);
G05B13/027 (US);
G05B13/048 (US);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
B25J9/163 (EP,US);
B25J9/1676 (EP,US);
G01C21/3446 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/07] | G05D1/02, G01C21/34, G05B13/04, G05B17/02, G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SOZIALBEWUSSTEN MODELLPRÄDIKTIVEN STEUERUNG EINER ROBOTERVORRICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MASCHINENLERNEN | [2022/07] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SOCIALLY AWARE MODEL PREDICTIVE CONTROL OF A ROBOTIC DEVICE USING MACHINE LEARNING | [2022/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE PRÉDICTIVE DE MODÈLE SOCIALEMENT CONSCIENT D'UN DISPOSITIF ROBOTIQUE À L'AIDE D'APPRENTISSAGE MACHINE | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 16.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3739418 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [E] 1-11* Paragraphs [0002], [0011], [0013], [0064], [0067], [0072], [0076], [0086]. *; | [XD] - WILLIAMS GRADY ET AL, "Information theoretic MPC for model-based reinforcement learning", 2017 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA), IEEE, (20170529), doi:10.1109/ICRA.2017.7989202, pages 1714 - 1721, XP033126944 [XD] 1-11 * Page 1714 Abstract, figure 1, page 1716 left column paragraph B, page 1717 left column first paragraph, last paragraph, right column, page 1718 left column algorithm 2, page 1719 right column paragraph B, page 1720 figures 5-7. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICRA.2017.7989202 | Examination | - KUSUMOTO RAPHAEL ET AL, "Informed Information Theoretic Model Predictive Control", 2019 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA), IEEE, (20190520), doi:10.1109/ICRA.2019.8793945, pages 2047 - 2053, XP033593934 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICRA.2019.8793945 |