EP3782765 - HIGHER TOUGHNESS STEEL ALLOY WELD DEPOSITS AND FLUX-CORED WELDING ELECTRODES FOR PRODUCING HIGHER TOUGHNESS STEEL ALLOY WELD DEPOSITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hobart Brothers LLC 101 Trade Square East Troy OH 45373 / US | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMATA, Mario A. Hobart Brothers LLC 101 Trade Square East Troy, OH 45373 / US | 02 /
BARHORST, Steven E. Hobart Brothers LLC 101 Trade Square East Troy, OH 45373 / US | 03 /
BUNDY, Joseph C. Hobart Brothers LLC 101 Trade Square East Troy, OH 45373 / US | 04 /
FIORE, Susan R. Hobart Brothers LLC 101 Trade Square East Troy, OH 45373 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20191247.4 | 17.08.2020 | [2021/08] | Priority number, date | US201916546016 | 20.08.2019 Original published format: US201916546016 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782765 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/02, B23K35/36, B23K35/362, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/08, // B23K35/38, B23K35/40 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
B23K35/0266 (EP,CN,US);
B23K35/3073 (CN);
B23K35/3026 (US);
B23K35/3608 (EP,CN);
B23K35/362 (EP);
B23K35/368 (CN);
B23K35/383 (EP,CN);
B23K9/16 (CN);
C22C22/00 (US);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/08 (EP);
B23K35/402 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWEISSGUT AUS EINER STAHLLEGIERUNG MIT HOHER ZÄHIGKEIT UND FÜLLDRAHTELEKTRODE ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2021/08] | English: | HIGHER TOUGHNESS STEEL ALLOY WELD DEPOSITS AND FLUX-CORED WELDING ELECTRODES FOR PRODUCING HIGHER TOUGHNESS STEEL ALLOY WELD DEPOSITS | [2021/08] | French: | DÉPÔTS DE SOUDURE EN ALLIAGE D'ACIER À RÉSISTANCE SUPÉRIEURE ET ÉLECTRODES DE SOUDAGE À FIL FOURRÉ POUR PRODUIRE DES DÉPÔTS DE SOUDURE EN ALLIAGE D'ACIER À RÉSISTANCE SUPÉRIEURE | [2021/08] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 19.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3189930 (KK KOBE SEIKO SHO (KOBE STEEL LTD ) [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3511110 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7,10-15 * Table 2, example 15 *; | [A]CN107717257 (ATLANTIC CHINA WELDING CONSUMABLES INC) [A] 1-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0058] , [0 59] *; | [A]CN106541225 (ATLANTIC CHINA WELDING CONSUMABLES INC) [A] 1-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0058] , [0 65] , [0 73] * |