EP3778304 - ILLUMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hymer GmbH & Co. KG Holzstrasse 19 88339 Bad Waldsee / DE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawetzki, Bernhard Friedhofstrasse 12 88364 Wolfegg / DE | 02 /
Hepe, Dominik Franz-Stapf-Str. 13 68212 Ravensburg / DE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Waller, Stefan Waller-IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Landshuter Allee 10 80637 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20191412.4 | 17.08.2020 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | DE201910122091 | 16.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019122091 | [2021/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778304 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q3/40, B60Q3/59, F21V21/14, B60Q3/53 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
B60Q3/40 (EP);
B60Q3/53 (EP);
B60Q3/59 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/07] | English: | ILLUMINATION SYSTEM | [2021/07] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 17.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR19980020365U (???) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]KR19980038928U (???) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]KR19980042373U (???) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2016025309 (ZHANG CHENG-CHUN [CN]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-5; | [XI]US2017267168 (DYLEWSKI II EUGENE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * [I] 4,6,7; | [A]KR20190033670 (KOREA COMMUNICATIONS SALES CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |