EP3828173 - SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLES AS HUMAN PLASMA KALLIKREIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioCryst Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 4505 Emperor Blvd. Durham, NC 27703 / US | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTIAN, Pravin L. 1139 Magnolia Run Hoover, Alabama 35226 / US | 02 /
BABU, Yarlagadda S. 4836 Southlake Pkwy Birmingham, Alabama 35244 / US | 03 /
WU, Minwan 2709 Paden Trl Vestavia Hills, Alabama 35226 / US | 04 /
CHINTAREDDY, Venkat R 3134 Renfro Road Vestavia Hills, Alabama 35216 / US | 05 /
KUMAR, Satish V 809 Mayapple Ct Birmingham, Alabama 35244 / US | 06 /
ZHANG, Weihe 2645 Manchester Court Vestavia, Alabama 35226 / US | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/35] |
Former [2021/22] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20191747.3 | 09.03.2015 | [2021/22] | Priority number, date | US201461949808P | 07.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461949808 P | US201461981515P | 18.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461981515 P | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828173 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3828173 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/14, A61K31/415 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
C07D231/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/415 (KR);
A61K31/4155 (KR);
A61P1/02 (EP,IL);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P11/04 (EP,IL);
A61P13/02 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P7/00 (EP,IL);
A61P7/02 (EP,IL);
A61P7/04 (EP,IL);
A61P7/10 (EP,IL);
A61P9/00 (EP,IL);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL);
A61P9/12 (EP,IL);
C07D401/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,IL,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D403/14 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 19.08.2020 | ME | 19.08.2020 | Validation states | MA | 19.08.2020 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PYRAZOLE ALS MENSCHLICHE PLASMAKALLIKREINHEMMER | [2021/22] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLES AS HUMAN PLASMA KALLIKREIN INHIBITORS | [2021/22] | French: | PYRAZOLES SUBSTITUÉS EN TANT QU`INHIBITEURS DE LA KALLICRÉINE PLASMATIQUE HUMAINE | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 25.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15759254.4 / EP3113772 | Divisional application(s) | EP22191079.7 / EP4180424 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2023/52] |
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9828269 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]); | [A]WO0200651 (DU PONT PHARM CO [US]) | by applicant | US4559157 | US4608392 | US4733655 | DE3633840 | US4800882 | US4820508 | US4886062 | US4938949 | WO9013332 | US4992478 | WO9112779 | US5102417 | US5419760 | US5429634 | US2001044445 | US2002091116 | US6770729 | US2004243225 | US2006069270 | US2006089496 | CN101298451 | CN102285963 | US2012115903 | US2012225057 | US2012258946 | WO2013IB68464 | WO2013IB36232 | WO2012IB22487 | WO2011IB92469 | WO2008IB73825 | WO2008IB58037 | WO2008IB34008 | WO2008IB05964 | WO2007IB94962 | WO2007IB43677 | WO2006IB55922 | WO2006IB69155 | WO2005IB23761 | WO2004IB78732 | WO2003IB99793 | WO2003IB47517 | WO2003IB47520 | WO2003IB16282 | WO2003IB24222 | WO2003IB15518 | WO2002IB24690 | WO2002IB83652 | WO2001IB29006 | WO1998IB57951 | WO2007IB53394 |