EP3796589 - INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, NETWORK DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chaojun Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WU, Zuomin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SHAO, Jiafeng Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
Zhang, Yunji Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
MA, Sha Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 20191854.7 | 30.03.2016 | [2021/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796589 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3796589 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04L27/26, H04L1/00 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
H04L1/0071 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/0031 (KR);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/003 (KR);
H04L1/0042 (KR);
H04L1/0068 (US);
H04L1/0072 (EP,US);
H04L1/1607 (CN);
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0057 (EP,US);
H04L5/02 (KR);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/21 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG, NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/12] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, NETWORK DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2021/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 24.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16895926.0 / EP3429114 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ASUSTEK, "Impact of shortened TTI on uplink transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. St Julian's, Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160214), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-161086 IMPACT OF SHORTENED TTI ON UPLINK TRANSMISSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; F, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160214), XP051054390 [A] 1-15 * sec.2; page 2 * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on PUSCH transmission with TTI shortening", vol. RAN WG1, no. St. Julian's, Malta; 20160215 - 20160219, (20160214), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-160655, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160214), XP051053984 [A] 1-15 * sec.2.1; page 3 * * sec.2.2; page 4 * | [A] - "3 Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Multiplexing and channel coding (Release 13)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.212, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20160329), vol. RAN WG1, no. V13.1.0, pages 1 - 129, XP051088460 [A] 1-15 * page 63 - page 65 * |