EP3783259 - ILLUMINATION DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seat, S.A. Autovia A-2, Km. 585 08760 Martorell / ES | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIQUÉ COSCONERA, Xavier Autovía A-2, Km. 585 08760 Martorell / ES | 02 /
CORULL MASSANA, Ernest Autovía A-2, Km. 585 08760 Martorell / ES | 03 /
MORON MORTE, Juan Carlos Autovía A-2, Km. 585 08760 Martorell / ES | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 20191895.0 | 20.08.2020 | [2021/08] | Priority number, date | ES20190030750 | 22.08.2019 Original published format: ES 201930750 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3783259 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3783259 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F21S43/20, F21S43/14, F21S43/15, F21S43/31, F21S43/40, B60Q1/00, B60Q1/26, G03H1/00, B63B32/50, B63H1/36, G03H1/22, G03H1/30, B63H16/18 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
B63B32/50 (EP);
B60Q1/00 (ES);
B60Q1/0058 (EP);
B60Q1/2607 (EP);
B63H1/36 (EP);
B63H16/18 (EP);
F21S43/15 (EP);
F21S43/255 (EP);
F21S43/26 (EP);
F21S43/31 (EP);
F21S43/40 (EP);
G02B5/32 (ES);
G03H1/0005 (EP);
G03H1/2205 (EP);
G03H1/30 (EP);
G03H2001/0055 (EP);
G03H2001/2234 (EP);
G03H2001/2252 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | F21S43/20, F21S43/14, F21S43/15, F21S43/31, F21S43/40, B60Q1/00, B60Q1/26, G03H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2021/08] | English: | ILLUMINATION DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE | [2021/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE POUR VÉHICULE | [2021/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 19.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.08.2020 | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CY | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | MK | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | IE | 20.08.2022 | LU | 20.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/26] | HU | 20.08.2020 | |
AL | 06.04.2022 | ||
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CY | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 20.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 20.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
MC | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06305360 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,4,8 * see attached machine translation; paragraphs [0014] - [0018]; figures 8-12 *; | [A]JP2003123513 (THREE M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES) [A] 1 * see attached machine translation; paragraphs [0001] - [0065]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP1344688 (MCGAVIGAN JOHN LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0032] , [0069] - [0105]; figures 1-18 *; | [A]DE102013008197 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] , [0054]; figures 3,5 *; | [A]KR20150134979 (SL CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15 * see attached machine translation; paragraphs [0048] - [0075]; figures 6-11 *; | [A]FR3025286 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2016087642 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,10-12 * pages 5-10; figures 3,4,9 *; | [A]JP2017059316 (KOITO MFG CO LTD, et al) [A] 1 * see attached machine translation; paragraphs [0039] , [0097] , [0098]; figures 2-4 *; | [AP]US2019310486 (FERRI JAMES J [CA]) [AP] 1,2,10-13* paragraphs [0037] - [0047]; figures 1,2,7a-7c * | by applicant | GB685286 | WO2017042345 |