EP3761035 - ASSAY FOR DETERMINING POTENTIAL TO SELF-ASSOCIATION OF A PROTEIN USING CONCENTRATION-DEPENDENT SELF-INTERACTION NANOPARTICLE SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARLOW, Michael 11 Park Place Apt. 409 New Rochelle, New York 10801 / US | 02 /
SENNETT, Michael 182 Powder House Boulevard Sommerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Michael c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/01] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20191942.0 | 18.08.2017 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201662376788P | 18.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662376788 P | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3761035 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3761035 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/58 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/6845 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
G01N21/25 (CN,IL);
G01N33/587 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
G01N21/31 (CN,IL);
G01N21/77 (EA,IL,US);
G01N2021/258 (CN,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES POTENZIALS ZUR SELBSTASSOZIATION EINES PROTEINS MITTELS KONZENTRATION-ABHÄNGIGER SELBSTWECHSELWIRKUNG-NANOPARTIKEL-SPEKTROSKOPIE | [2023/14] | English: | ASSAY FOR DETERMINING POTENTIAL TO SELF-ASSOCIATION OF A PROTEIN USING CONCENTRATION-DEPENDENT SELF-INTERACTION NANOPARTICLE SPECTROSCOPY | [2021/01] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR DETERMINER LE POTENTIEL À L'AUTOASSOCIATION D'UNE PROTEINE À L'AIDE DE LA SPECTROSCOPIE DE L'AUTOASSOCIATION DES NANOPARTICULES DÉPENDANTE DE LA CONCENTRATION | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/01] | TEST ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES POTENZIALS ZUR SELBSTASSOZIATION EINES PROTEINS MIT KONZENTRATIONSABHÄNGIGER SELBSTINTERAKTIONSNANOPARTIKELSPEKTROSKOPIE | ||
Former [2021/01] | MÉTHODE POUR DÉTERMINER LE POTENTIEL À L'AUTOASSOCIATION D'UNE PROTÉINE À L'AIDE DE LA SPECTROSCOPIE DE L'AUTOASSOCIATION DES NANOPARTICULES DÉPENDANTE DE LA CONCENTRATION | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17761159.7 / EP3500856 | Divisional application(s) | EP23219194.0 Application refused : 23.04.2024 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 05.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2016115475 (BIOGEN MA INC [US]); | Examination | WO2009039502 | by applicant | US771997 | US4080264 | US7087411 | US2007291265 | US7514938 | US7927583 |