Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4297229 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2024 | A3 | EP4297229 | 27.12.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP20192020 | 20.08.2020 | EP23202455 | 20.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11641115 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2023 | B2 | US2022060024 | 24.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20192020 | 20.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3958426 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2023 | C0 | EP3958426 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2023 | B1 | EP3958426 | 23.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20192020 | 20.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2967267T | 29.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP20192020 | 20.08.2020 | Type | Divisional application | EP4297229 |