EP3958426 - CONVERTER BASED GENERATORS AND METHOD FOR SUPPLYING ELECTRICAL POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 11.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Wobben Properties GmbH Borsigstraße 26 26607 Aurich / DE | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROMBACH, Johannes 13437 Berlin / DE | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 20192020.4 | 20.08.2020 | [2022/08] | Procedural language | DE | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 11.10.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/46] | 19.10.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2023/47] | 19.10.2023 | Date of registration [2023/47] | 11.10.2023 | Date of legal effect [2023/47] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 19.10.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2023/47] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3958426 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 05 |