EP3798193 - DEVICE FOR COATING CONTAINERS WITH BYPASS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kammerl, Martin Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
Neubauer, Michael Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 03 /
Voth, Klaus Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Hannke Bittner & Partner mbB Regensburg Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/13] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 20192282.0 | 21.08.2020 | [2021/13] | Priority number, date | DE201910126291 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019126291 | [2021/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798193 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3798193 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, B65G37/00, B65G49/00, C23C16/02, C23C16/44, C23C16/04, C23C16/54, C23C16/50 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
C03C17/003 (EP);
B65G54/02 (EP,US);
B65G47/51 (US);
B65G47/841 (US);
C03C17/004 (EP);
C23C16/045 (EP);
C23C16/54 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON BEHÄLTNISSEN MIT BYPASS UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2021/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR COATING CONTAINERS WITH BYPASS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A DEVICE | [2021/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REVÊTEMENT DES RÉCIPIENTS POURVU DE DÉRIVATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 30.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | IE | 21.08.2023 | LU | 21.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | FR | 16.10.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
FR | 16.10.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015036196 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 37, line 20 - page 39, line 3; figure 8 *; | [A]DE102013112091 (TILL VOLKER [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0030] , [0 31] *; | [XA]WO2017162509 (KHS CORPOPLAST GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 1 - line 19; figures 1,3,6,7 * * page 10, line 11 - page 12, line 6 * [A] 2-10 |