EP3787005 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF OPERATION OF LINEAR ION TRAPS IN DUAL BALANCED AC/UNBALANCED RF MODE FOR 2D MASS SPECTROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo Finnigan LLC 355 River Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOVTOUN, Viatcheslav V. 3200 Payne Ave., Apt. 736 San Jose, CA 95117 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 20192743.1 | 25.08.2020 | [2021/09] | Priority number, date | US201916552614 | 27.08.2019 Original published format: US201916552614 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787005 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3787005 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/00, H01J49/02, H01J49/42 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
H01J49/426 (EP);
H01J49/4225 (CN,US);
H01J49/0031 (EP,US);
H01J49/022 (EP,US);
H01J49/423 (EP);
H01J49/4265 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] |
Former [2021/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB LINEARER IONENFALLEN IN EINEM DUALEN ABGEGLICHENEN WECHSELSPANNUNG-MODUS/UNABGEGLICHENEN HF-MODUS FÜR 2D-MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE | [2021/09] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF OPERATION OF LINEAR ION TRAPS IN DUAL BALANCED AC/UNBALANCED RF MODE FOR 2D MASS SPECTROMETRY | [2021/09] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE PIÈGES À IONS LINÉAIRES EN MODE DOUBLE CA ÉQUILIBRÉ/RF NON ÉQUILIBRÉ POUR LA SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE 2D | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 03.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008121795 (SUGIYAMA MASUYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2011049358 (GREEN MARTIN RAYMOND [GB], et al); | [XI]EP3249680 (THERMO FINNIGAN LLC [US]) |