EP3760252 - MEDICAL NEEDLE WITH PROTECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Top 19-10 Senjunakai-cho Adachi-ku, Tokyo 120-0035 / JP | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Daisuke c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Top 19-10, Senjunakai-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo, 120-0035 / JP | 02 /
TAKAYANAGI, Sho c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Top 19-10, Senjunakai-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo, 120-0035 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Dai c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Top 19-10, Senjunakai-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo, 120-0035 / JP | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20193109.4 | 17.03.2017 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | JP20160088440 | 26.04.2016 Original published format: JP 2016088440 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760252 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3760252 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/158, A61M5/32, // A61M5/162 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61M5/158 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/32 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/3496 (CN,US);
A61M5/1626 (EP,CN);
A61M5/3293 (EP,CN);
A61B2017/347 (CN,US);
A61B2017/3492 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE NADEL MIT SCHUTZ | [2021/01] | English: | MEDICAL NEEDLE WITH PROTECTOR | [2021/01] | French: | AIGUILLE MÉDICALE AVEC PROTECTEUR | [2023/02] |
Former [2021/01] | AIGUILLE MÉDICALE MUNIE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 28.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17789130.6 / EP3449962 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/12] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 21.09.2023 | |
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0775671 (NISSHO KK) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]EP0664139 (NISSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006135910 (LUTHER RONALD B [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2008029812 (NIPRO CORP) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2399625 (JMS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2013192738 (TERUMO CORP) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0664139 | by applicant | JP3134920B |