EP3796155 - IMPROVING ACQUISITION PROCESS OF GUI ELEMENTS USING USER INPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walkme Ltd. 3 Kremenetski Street 6789903 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAHUM, Nir 3 Kremenetski St 678990 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
SHEMER, Moran 3 Kremenetski St 678990 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
ZOHAR, Ron 3 Kremenetski St 678990 Tel Aviv / IL | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 20193318.1 | 28.08.2020 | [2021/12] | Priority number, date | WO2019IL51037 | 19.09.2019 Original published format: PCT/IL2019/051037 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796155 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3796155 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/38 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,IL,US);
G06F9/451 (IL,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DES ERFASSUNGSPROZESSES VON GUI-ELEMENTEN MITHILFE VON BENUTZEREINGABEN | [2021/12] | English: | IMPROVING ACQUISITION PROCESS OF GUI ELEMENTS USING USER INPUT | [2021/12] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DU PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'ÉLÉMENTS D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUE À L'AIDE D'UNE ENTRÉE D'UTILISATEUR | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 23.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005257195 (MORROW GREGORY O [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0157]; figures 5,6 * | Examination | US2005257194 | by applicant | US9922008 | US9934782 | WO2019IL50475 |