EP3779445 - BOVINE HERPESVIRUS DETECTION AND TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College 104B University Administration Building 3810 W. Lakeshore Dr. Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOWDHURY, Shafiqul I. 17524 West Purple Martin Court Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20193609.3 | 31.07.2015 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | US201462032098P | 01.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462032098 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779445 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/56983 (EP,US);
G01N2333/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NACHWEIS UND BEHANDLUNG VON BOVINEM HERPESVIRUS | [2021/07] | English: | BOVINE HERPESVIRUS DETECTION AND TREATMENT | [2021/07] | French: | DÉTECTION ET TRAITEMENT DU VIRUS DE L'HERPÈS BOVIN | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 16.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15753250.8 / EP3194968 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - F. A. M. RIJSEWIJK ET AL, "Epitopes on glycoprotein E and on the glycoprotein E/glycoprotein I complex of bovine herpesvirus 1 are expressed by all of 222 isolates and 11 vaccine strains", ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, (20000501), vol. 145, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s007050050684, ISSN 0304-8608, pages 921 - 936, XP055160140 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s007050050684 | [Y] - C LETELLIER ET AL, "Characterization of monoclonal antibodies directed against the bovine herpesvirus-1 glycoprotein E and use for the differentiation between vaccinated and infected animals", VETERINARY MICROBIOLOGY, (20011201), vol. 83, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0378-1135(01)00430-8, ISSN 0378-1135, pages 301 - 315, XP055160375 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1135(01)00430-8 | [Y] - ALAA A. EL-KHOLY ET AL, "Baculovirus expression and diagnostic utility of the glycoprotein E of bovine herpesvirus-1.1 Egyptian strain "Abu-Hammad"", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, (20130701), vol. 191, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jviromet.2013.03.024, ISSN 0166-0934, pages 33 - 40, XP055160128 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jviromet.2013.03.024 | [Y] - G.J WELLENBERG ET AL, "Antibodies against bovine herpesvirus (BHV) 5 may be differentiated from antibodies against BHV1 in a BHV1 glycoprotein E blocking ELISA", VETERINARY MICROBIOLOGY, (20010101), vol. 78, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0378-1135(00)00283-2, ISSN 0378-1135, pages 79 - 84, XP055160137 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1135(00)00283-2 | by applicant | US4036945 | US4331647 | EP0154204 | US5747654 | US6221360 | US2002019517 | US2012269728 | - KAASHOEK et al., Vet Rec, (19960000), vol. 139, no. 17, pages 416 - 21 | - TIKOO et al., Adv Virus Res, (19950000), vol. 45, pages 191 - 223 | - JONESCHOWDHURY, Animal Health Res Rev, (20070000), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 187 - 205 | - LIPINSKA et al., J Virol, (20060000), vol. 80, no. 12, pages 5822 - 32 | - LIU et al., J Virol, (20080000), vol. 82, no. 15, pages 7432 - 42 | - CHOWDHURY et al., J. Neurovirol., (20100000), vol. 17, pages 457 - 465 | - CHOWDHURY SIWEI HWEISS MPANNHORST KPAULSEN DB, "A triple gene mutant of BoHV-1 administered intranasally is significantly more efficacious than a BoHV-1 glycoprotein E-deleted virus against a virulent BoHV-1 challenge", Vaccine, (20140000), vol. 32, no. 39, doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2014.07.004, pages 4909 - 4915, XP055609597 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2014.07.004 | - ODELL et al., Nature, (19850000), vol. 313, pages 810 - 812 | - LAWTON et al., Plant Molecular Biology, (19870000), vol. 9, pages 315 - 324 | - WALKER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19870000), vol. 84, pages 6624 - 6628 | - YANG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19900000), vol. 87, pages 4144 - 4148 | - WANG et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19920000), vol. 12, page 3399 | - SULLIVAN et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19890000), vol. 215, page 431 | - HUDSPETH et al., Plant Molecular Biology, (19890000), vol. 12, pages 579 - 589 | - CHANDLER et al., The Plant Cell, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 1175 - 1183 | - AN, Methods in Enzymology, (19870000), vol. 153, page 292 | - POTRYKUS et al., Mol. Gen. Genet., (19850000), vol. 199, pages 183 - 188 | - THILLET et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19880000), vol. 263, pages 12500 - 12508 | - OW et al., Science, (19860000), vol. 234, pages 856 - 859 | - PRASHER et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19850000), vol. 126, pages 1259 - 1268 | - NIEDZ et al., Plant Cell Reports, (19950000), vol. 14, page 403 | - CLACKSONWELLS, Trends Biotechnol., (19940000), vol. 12, pages 173 - 184 | - ROBERTS et al., PNAS, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 2429 - 2433 | - LOWMAN et al., Biochemistry, (19910000), vol. 30, pages 10832 - 10838 | - VENTURINI et al., Protein Peptide Letters, (19940000), vol. 1, pages 70 - 75 | - BORK, P.HORN, L.SANDER, C., "The immunoglobulin fold. Structural classification, sequence patterns and common core", J. Mol. Biol., (19940000), vol. 242, pages 309 - 320 | - BORK, P.DOOLITTLE, R. F., "Proposed acquisition of an animal protein domain by bacteria", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, doi:10.1073/pnas.89.19.8990, pages 8990 - 8994, XP007910833 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.19.8990 | - JONES, E. Y., "The immunoglobulin superfamily Curr", Opinion Struct. Biol., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 846 - 852 | - CAMPBELL, I. D.SPITZFADEN, C., Building proteins with fibronectin type III modules Structure, (19940000), vol. 2, pages 233 - 337 | - KOHLERMILSTEIN, Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, pages 495 - 97 | - KOZBOR et al., Immunol Today, (19830000), vol. 4, page 72 | - PAL et al., Biosens. Bioelectron., (20070000), vol. 22, no. 9-10, pages 2329 - 36 | - CHOWDHURY, Microbiol, (19960000), vol. 52, no. 1-2, pages 13 - 23 | - WEI HWANG YCHOWDHURY SI, "Bovine herpesvirus type 1 (BHV-1) UL49.5 luminal domain residues 30 to 32 are critical for MHC-I down-regulation in virus-infected cells", PloS one, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 10, page e25742 | - BRUM MCCOATS CSANGENA RBDOSTER AJONES CCHOWDHURY SI, "Bovine herpesvirus type 1 (BoHV-1) anterograde neuronal transport from trigeminal ganglia to nose and eye requires glycoprotein E", JNeurovirol, (20090000), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 196 - 201 | - JONES CCHOWDHURY S, "Bovine herpesvirus type 1 (BHV-1) is an important cofactor in the bovine respiratory disease complex", Vet Clin North Am Food Anim Pract, vol. 26, no. 2, pages 303 - 321 | - JONES CCHOWDHURY S, "A review of the biology of bovine herpesvirus type 1 (BHV-1), its role as a cofactor in the bovine respiratory disease complex and development of improved vaccines", Anim Health Res Rev, (20070000), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1017/S146625230700134X, pages 187 - 205, XP009126726 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S146625230700134X | - KOPPERS-LALIC DREITS EARESSING MELIPINSKA ADABELE RKOCH JMARCONDES REZENDE MADMIRAAL PVAN LEEUWEN DBIENKOWSKA-SZEWCZYK K et al., "Varicelloviruses avoid T cell recognition by UL49.5-mediated inactivation of the transporter associated with antigen processing", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20050000), vol. 102, no. 14, doi:10.1073/pnas.0501463102, pages 5144 - 5149, XP002439870 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0501463102 | - NATARAJ CEIDMANN SHARIHARAN MJSUR JHPERRY GASRIKUMARAN S, "Bovine herpesvirus 1 downregulates the expression of bovine MHC class I molecules", Viral Immunol, (19970000), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 21 - 34 | - BUTCHI NBJONES CPEREZ SDOSTER ACHOWDHURY SI, "Envelope protein Us9 is required for the anterograde transport of bovine herpesvirus type 1 from trigeminal ganglia to nose and eye upon reactivation", JNeurovirol, (20070000), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 384 - 388 | - LIU ZFBRUM MCDOSTER AJONES CCHOWDHURY SI, "A bovine herpesvirus type 1 mutant virus specifying a carboxyl-terminal truncation of glycoprotein E is defective in anterograde neuronal transport in rabbits and calves", Journal of virology, (20080000), vol. 82, no. 15, pages 7432 - 7442 |