EP3822025 - CLAMPING FIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sikla Holding GmbH Kornstrasse 4 4614 Marchtrenk / AT | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menz, Peter Ulmenring 15 78661 Dietingen / DE | 02 /
Braack, Ellen Böttinger Straße 2/1 78549 Spaichingen / DE | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 20193709.1 | 31.08.2020 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | DE201910130478 | 12.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019130478 | [2021/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822025 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3822025 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/10, B25B5/12, B25B5/14, F16L3/24, // F16L3/10 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
B25B5/102 (EP);
B25B5/12 (EP);
B25B5/14 (EP);
F16L3/24 (EP);
F16L3/1016 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | B25B5/10, B25B5/12, B25B5/14, F16L3/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINSPANNBEFESTIGUNG | [2021/20] | English: | CLAMPING FIXTURE | [2021/20] | French: | FIXATION DE SERRAGE | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 01.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | IE | 31.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4435556 (STANGE PAUL [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 15; figures 1,5,7 *; | [A]DE29513823U (BERNECKER KLAUS D [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 9, line 30 - page 16, line 11; figures 1,2,3,4 *; | [Y]DE29515032U (BERNECKER KLAUS DIETER [DE]) [Y] 2-4,9 * page 6, line 21 - page 8, line 30; figures 3,5 *; | [A]DE19653538 (SIKLA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 60; figures 5,6 *; | [A]DE29922212U (STANGE PAUL [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0037] - [0050]; figures 1,3 *; | [XY]EP1043532 (STANGE PAUL [DE]) [X] 1,6-8 * paragraphs [0014] - [0037]; figures 1-8,17 * [Y] 2-4,9; | [A]DE19961003 (STANGE PAUL [DE]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0017] - [0032]; figures 1,3,5,8 *; | [A]DE202010006322U (SIKLA HOLDING GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0026] - [0033]; figure 6 * |