EP3961483 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTHENTICATING AN OCCUPANT WITHIN AN INTERIOR OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Spitalstrasse 5 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2024/39] |
Former [2024/18] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Pestalozzistrasse 2 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2023/13] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited The Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTH, Alexander 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | 02 /
WELK, Douglas Rossville, Indiana 46065 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20193897.4 | 01.09.2020 | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3961483 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, B60R25/25 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
G06V40/172 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (CN,US);
B60R25/25 (EP);
G06F18/214 (CN);
G06F18/2413 (US);
G06N3/045 (CN);
G06V10/60 (US);
G06V20/59 (EP,US);
G06V40/103 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] |
Former [2022/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINES INSASSEN IN EINEM INNENRAUM EINES FAHRZEUGES | [2022/09] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTHENTICATING AN OCCUPANT WITHIN AN INTERIOR OF A VEHICLE | [2022/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN OCCUPANT À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UN HABITACLE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2022/09] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 29.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |