Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023272610 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20194136 | 02.09.2020 | WO2021EP73903 | 30.08.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023540822 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20194136 | 02.09.2020 | WO2021EP73903 | 30.08.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116113392 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | EP20194136 | 02.09.2020 | WO2021EP73903 | 30.08.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022049035 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20194136 | 02.09.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3964656 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20194136 | 02.09.2020 |