Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
24.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.04.2024 | First examination report | |
20.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.09.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
16.09.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
16.09.2022 | Change - designated states | published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.02.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
02.09.2020 | Change - representative |