Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.02.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
06.10.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.09.2022 | First examination report | |
26.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.09.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
24.09.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 | Change - applicant | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 | Change - inventor | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
01.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.02.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
08.09.2020 | Change - representative | |
04.09.2020 | Change - representative |