EP3800341 - AUTOMATIC TESTING OF ELECTRIC MACHINE DISCONNECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 450 South Meridian Street Indianapolis, IN 46225 / US | For all designated states Rolls-Royce North American Technologies, Inc. 2059 S. Tibbs Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46241 / US | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Meallie, Paul 7380 E County Road 900 N Brownsburg, IN 46112 / US | 02 /
Smith, Alan 3315 Nassau Court Greenwood, IN 46143 / US | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/14] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20194605.0 | 04.09.2020 | [2021/14] | Priority number, date | US201916592055 | 03.10.2019 Original published format: US201916592055 | [2021/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800341 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3800341 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/32, F02C7/268, B60L50/16 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
F02C7/32 (EP);
G01M15/14 (US);
B60L3/0061 (EP);
B60L50/16 (EP);
F02C7/268 (EP);
B60L2240/421 (EP);
F05D2220/768 (EP);
F05D2260/4023 (EP);
F05D2260/80 (EP);
F05D2270/304 (EP);
F05D2270/309 (EP);
F05D2270/807 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE PRÜFUNG DER TRENNUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE | [2021/14] | English: | AUTOMATIC TESTING OF ELECTRIC MACHINE DISCONNECT | [2021/14] | French: | TEST AUTOMATIQUE DE DÉCONNEXION DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/14] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 23.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2023 | CZ | 01.03.2023 | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | ES | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | IT | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | NL | 01.03.2023 | PL | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SE | 01.03.2023 | SI | 01.03.2023 | SK | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | NO | 01.06.2023 | GR | 02.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | PT | 03.07.2023 | IE | 04.09.2023 | LU | 04.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
IE | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 04.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
IE | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
LU | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
LU | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
DK | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SI | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SK | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
CZ | 01.03.2023 | ||
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
ES | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
PT | 03.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
NL | 01.03.2023 | ||
PL | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
GR | 02.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SE | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
NO | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006260323 (MOULEBHAR DJAMAL [US]) [A] 1,14,15* paragraph [0078] *; | [XI]US2011295455 (SCHENK RENE [DE]) [X] 1-8,10,11,14,15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0 44] , [0 45] * [I] 9,12,13; | [XI]DE102011054480 (PORSCHE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,14,15 * figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 29] * [I] 8,9 |