EP3909629 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FILTERING RESPIRATORY GAS AND BUFFER TANK FOR A SYSTEM FOR RESPIRATORY GAS FILTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZeoSys Medical GmbH Im Biotechnologiepark 9 14943 Luckenwalde / DE | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedrich, Thomas 10367 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Ewers, Christian 14943 Luckenwalde / DE | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 20195165.4 | 08.09.2020 | [2021/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909629 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, A61M16/10 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
A61M16/0093 (EP);
A61M16/1065 (EP);
B01D53/0415 (EP);
A61M2202/0241 (EP);
A61M2205/125 (EP);
A61M2205/18 (EP);
A61M2205/3382 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
A61M2205/584 (EP);
A61M2205/7536 (EP);
A61M2205/7563 (EP);
A61M2230/437 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2253/108 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FILTRATION VON ATEMGAS SOWIE PUFFERBEHÄLTER FÜR EIN SYSTEM ZUR FILTRATION VON ATEMGAS | [2021/46] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FILTERING RESPIRATORY GAS AND BUFFER TANK FOR A SYSTEM FOR RESPIRATORY GAS FILTRATION | [2021/46] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FILTRATION DE GAZ RESPIRATOIRE AINSI QUE RÉSERVOIR TAMPON POUR UN SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION DE GAZ RESPIRATOIRE | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 13.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4004585 (BOEHRINGER JOHN R) [I] 1-15 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 58; figure 2 *; | [I]WO2008138014 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 3-7 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0011] - [0015] - [0032] *; | [I]WO2012128694 (NORDIC GAS CLEANING AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 2a-5 * * page 4, line 4 - page 12, line 11 * * page 16, line 14 - page 23, line 15 ** page 26, line 26 - page 28, line 10 * | by applicant | WO2007093640 | EP2237854 | EP2926897 | EP2946826 |