EP3967661 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING BATTERY GRADE METAL SULPHATE SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northvolt AB Alströmergatan 20 112 47 Stockholm / SE | For all designated states Metal Trade Overseas AG Baarestrasse 18 6302 Zug / CH | [2023/30] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Northvolt AB Gamla Brogatan 26 11120 Stockholm / SE | ||
For all designated states Metal Trade Overseas AG Baarestrasse 18 6302 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANTTO, Cornelia 132 49 Saltsjö Boo / SE | 02 /
NIEMI, Tom 67100 Karleby / FI | 03 /
ALISAARI, Pekka 31400 Somero / FI | 04 /
LINDELL, Esa 28360 Pori / FI | 05 /
LUOMA, Rauno 28220 Pori / FI | 06 /
LAUKKANEN, Tuomo 32710 Sampu / FI | 07 /
TYNJÄLÄ, Pekka 80260 Joensuu / FI | 08 /
LASSI, Ulla 90450 Kempele / FI | [2023/30] |
Former [2022/11] | 01 /
LANTTO, Cornelia 122 44 Enskede / SE | ||
02 /
NIEMI, Tom 67100 Karleby / FI | |||
03 /
ALISAARI, Pekka 31400 Somero / FI | |||
04 /
LINDELL, Esa 28360 Pori / FI | |||
05 /
LUOMA, Rauno 28220 Pori / FI | |||
06 /
LAUKKANEN, Tuomo 32710 Sampu / FI | |||
07 /
TYNJÄLÄ, Pekka 80260 Joensuu / FI | |||
08 /
LASSI, Ulla 90450 Kempele / FI | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20195318.9 | 09.09.2020 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967661 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3967661 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/10, C22B7/00, C01G51/10 | [2022/11] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METALLSULFATLÖSUNGEN IN BATTERIEQUALITÄT | [2022/11] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING BATTERY GRADE METAL SULPHATE SOLUTIONS | [2022/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE SOLUTIONS DE SULFATE DE MÉTAL DE QUALITÉ DE BATTERIE | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 23.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2022 | Observations by third parties | 24.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2022 | Observations by third parties | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23179669.9 / EP4234496 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.2024
01.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE Umicore Rue du Marais 31 1000 Brussels / BE Opponent's representative Umicore RDI Patent Department Watertorenstraat 33 2250 Olen / BE | 02
26.04.2024
01.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE Glencore Nikkelverk AS P. O. Box 604 4606 Kristiansand / NO Opponent's representative Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2024/23] | 15.05.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | GR | 27.10.2023 | |
IS | 26.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2104053 (INCO LTD [CA]); | [XI]JPS6345131 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [XDA]US7364717 (FIERRO CRISTIAN [US], et al); | [YA]US7799296 (FETCENKO MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [XI]WO2014009208 (BASF SE [DE], et al) | Examination | CN104532295B | CN107739059 | by applicant | US7364717 | US9416023 | other | JP2011126757 | US9321656 | WO2022053448 | Opposition | US2533245 | US3777003 | US3902896 | US3958947 | GB2104053 | US5250273 | US6554915 | US7364717 | WO2009146485 | US7799296 | JP2011126757 | US2015175438 | CN107739059 | DE102018005586 | SU385927 | CA1210592 | CA2008063 | US9321656 |