EP3767984 - COMMUNICATING WITH A MACHINE TO MACHINE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Global Enterprise Limited Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | For all designated states DABCO Limited Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2023/51] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states Vodafone IP Licensing Limited Vodafone House The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURNE, Sophie Nicole c/o Vodafone Group Services Limited Babbage House The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | 02 /
SNAPE, Tim c/o Vodafone Group Services Limited Babbage House The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2021/09] |
Former [2021/03] | 01 /
BONE, Nick c/o Vodafone Group Services Limited Babbage House The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | ||
02 /
SNAPE, Tim c/o Vodafone Group Services Limited Babbage House The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 20195438.5 | 12.09.2014 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | GB20130016370 | 13.09.2013 Original published format: GB 201316370 | GB20130018339 | 16.10.2013 Original published format: GB 201318339 | GB20140009652 | 30.05.2014 Original published format: GB 201409652 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767984 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3767984 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04W88/02, G06F13/16, G06F13/40, H04L67/125, G06F13/28, H04W4/12, H04W4/14, H04W4/50, H04W4/70, H04W12/02, H04W88/06, H04W12/0431, H04W12/37, H04W52/02, H04W80/06 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
G06F13/1689 (EP,GB,US);
H04L63/04 (US);
G06F13/28 (EP,GB,US);
G06F13/4027 (EP,US);
G06F21/606 (US);
G06F21/71 (US);
G06F9/44 (GB);
G06F9/4401 (US);
H04B1/3816 (US);
H04L63/00 (GB);
H04L63/029 (US);
H04L63/0428 (GB,US);
H04L63/0442 (GB,US);
H04L63/061 (US);
H04L63/062 (EP,GB,US);
H04L63/068 (GB);
H04L63/08 (GB,US);
H04L63/0823 (US);
H04L63/0853 (GB);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (GB,US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/166 (GB,US);
H04L63/20 (US);
H04L67/00 (GB);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/1095 (US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L9/0816 (GB);
H04L9/0819 (GB);
H04L9/0861 (GB,US);
H04W12/00 (GB);
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04W12/04 (GB,US);
H04W12/0431 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W12/084 (GB);
H04W12/37 (EP,GB,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,GB,US);
H04W4/50 (EP,GB,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,GB,US);
H04W52/0229 (EP,GB,US);
H04W8/005 (GB);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W80/06 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04L2463/061 (EP,US);
H04L63/0838 (EP,US);
H04W12/033 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | H04W12/04, H04W88/02, H04W4/00, G06F13/16, G06F13/28, G06F13/40, H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W4/12, H04W4/14, H04W4/50, H04W4/70, H04W12/00, H04W12/02, H04W28/08, H04W52/02, H04W80/06, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATION MIT EINER MASCHINE-MASCHINE-VORRICHTUNG | [2021/03] | English: | COMMUNICATING WITH A MACHINE TO MACHINE DEVICE | [2021/03] | French: | COMMUNICATION AVEC UN DISPOSITIF MACHINE À MACHINE | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 03.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14777370.9 / EP3044928 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 11.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   08.11.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 21.05.2024 | |
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010102259 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al); |