EP3967585 - BRAKE PAD FOR A BICYCLE OR A MOTORBIKE DISC BRAKE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Golec, Marcin Windsor Avenue, 60 London SW19 2RR / GB | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Farago-Schauer, Peter Andreas Farago Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Farago-Schauer, Peter Andreas FARAGO Patentanwälte Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20195945.9 | 14.09.2020 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967585 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62L1/00, F16D65/02, F16D65/847 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B62L1/005 (EP);
F16D65/092 (US);
F16D65/095 (EP);
F16D65/847 (EP,US);
F16D2065/788 (US);
F16D2200/0021 (US);
F16D2250/0084 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSBELAG FÜR EINE FAHRRAD- ODER MOTORRADSCHEIBENBREMSANORDNUNG | [2022/11] | English: | BRAKE PAD FOR A BICYCLE OR A MOTORBIKE DISC BRAKE ASSEMBLY | [2022/11] | French: | PLAQUETTE DE FREIN POUR UN ENSEMBLE FREIN À DISQUE DE BICYCLETTE OU DE MOTO | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 07.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN202557717U (RUIBIN CHEN); | [A]US2012318621 (TEAGAN MICHAEL [US]); | [XI]CN203161926U (WANG ZHIYANG); | [X]CN203892422U (WEN YUANHONG); | [A]EP2902654 (TRIBULL PRECISE IND CO LTD [TW]); | by applicant | US6206151 | DE202016102626U | DE102015117607 | DE102011123009 | US10088002 | EP3415411 | EP3604848 |