EP3780623 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gensquare LLC 2nd Floor, Dongrim Building, 38 Gangnam-daero 62-gil Gangnam-gu Seoul, 06254 / KR | [2022/34] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states INNOTIVE LTD Hill Dickinson LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London, EC2A 2EW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Shin Ji 103-1301 Boramae Parkvill 711 Sindaebang 2-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul / KR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20196028.3 | 20.04.2012 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | KR20110108455 | 24.10.2011 Original published format: KR 20110108455 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780623 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/91, H04N19/105, H04N19/11, H04N19/157, H04N19/593, H04N19/176 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H04N19/11 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/117 (US);
H04N19/119 (EP,KR);
H04N19/122 (KR);
H04N19/124 (KR,US);
H04N19/13 (KR);
H04N19/157 (EP,US);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/17 (US);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/44 (US);
H04N19/593 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/61 (US);
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDDECODIERUNG | [2021/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMAGE DECODING | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGES | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 16.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12843965.0 / EP2773118 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI] - BROSS B ET AL, "High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) text specification draft 6", no. JCTVC-H1003, (20120402), 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 20120201 - 20120210; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct/doc_end_user/documents/8_San%20Jose/wg11/JCTVC-H1003-v22.zip JCTVC-H1003_dK.doc, (20120402), XP030233254 [XP] 8 * sections 7.3.7, 7.4.6, 7.4.7, 8.4, 8.6 and 8.7.1 * [I] 1-7,9,10 | [Y] - BROSS (FRAUNHOFER) B ET AL, "WD4: Working Draft 4 of High-Efficiency Video Coding", no. JCTVC-F803, (20111022), 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 20110714 - 20110722; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jct/doc_end_user/documents/6_Torino/wg11/JCTVC-F803-v6.zip JCTVC-F803_d4.doc, (20111022), XP030229352 [Y] 1-10 * sections 7.3.7, 7.4.6, 7.4.7, 8.3, 8.5 and 8.6.1 * | [Y] - W-J CHIEN ET AL, "Parsing friendly intra mode coding", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110702), no. JCTVC-F459, XP030009482 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - CHEN (BOG COORDINATOR) J, "BoG report on intra mode coding with fixed number of MPM candidates", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110720), no. JCTVC-F765, XP030009788 [A] 1-10 | [A] - T-D CHUANG ET AL, "Luma Intra Prediction Mode Coding", 6. JCT-VC MEETING; 97. MPEG MEETING; 14-7-2011 - 22-7-2011; TORINO; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20110701), no. JCTVC-F062, XP030009085 [A] 1-10 * last paragraph of section [2. 1 Proposed two-level intra most probable mode coding] * * section [2.2 2nd level most probable mode selection] * | [AP] - MAANI E ET AL, "Intra mode clean up: coding using logical mode numbering", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/2012_02_H_SANJOSE/, (20120204), XP002744668 [AP] 1-10 * the whole document * |