EP3796307 - BACKING MEMBER AND ULTRASONIC PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEDA, HISASHI c/o SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 20196522.5 | 16.09.2020 | [2021/12] | Priority number, date | JP20190170747 | 19.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019170747 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796307 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3796307 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/00, B06B1/06 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G10K11/002 (EP);
G01N29/2437 (US);
B06B1/0681 (EP);
B06B1/0685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRÄGERKÖRPER UND ULTRASCHALLSONDE | [2021/12] | English: | BACKING MEMBER AND ULTRASONIC PROBE | [2021/12] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT ET SONDE À ULTRASONS | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 28.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2881336 (ELION HERBERT A) [X] 1-6,9 * figure 1 * * columns 1,2 * * claims 1-8 *[I] 7,8,10; | [X]US5267221 (MILLER DAVID G [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10 * figures 4-6,14 * * columns 5-7 *; | [X]US5592730 (GREENSTEIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10 * abstract * * figures 1,24,25 * * columns 4,5 * * column 9 *; | [X]US2017338398 (SORIMACHI HARUO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,10 * abstract * * figures 1,14-18 * * pages 2,6-8 * | by applicant | JP2017208772 |