EP3777547 - OXIDATIVELY STABLE POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACID CONTAINING OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEFANSKI, Michael Lenn 1875 Flanagan Station Road Winchester, KY Kentucky 40391 / US | 02 /
CRAWFORD, Kristine Sheila 3116 Dunes Drive Ellicott City, MD Maryland 21042 / US | 03 /
XUEJUN, Tang 3506 Lowlen Court Ellicott City, MD Maryland 21042 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 20197066.2 | 01.11.2012 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | US201161554291P | 01.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161554291 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777547 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23D9/013, A23D9/06, C11B5/00, A23D9/007 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A23D9/007 (EP,KR,US);
A23D9/06 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A23L3/3472 (KR,US);
A23L27/82 (EP,KR,US);
A23L3/3544 (KR,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,KR,US);
C11B5/0007 (KR,US);
C11B5/0085 (EP,KR,US);
C11B5/0092 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1868, A23V2250/187, A23V2250/1882 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OXIDATIONSSTABILE MEHRFACH UNGESÄTTIGTE FETTSÄUREN MIT EINEM ÖL | [2021/07] | English: | OXIDATIVELY STABLE POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACID CONTAINING OIL | [2021/07] | French: | HUILE CONTENANT UN ACIDE GRAS POLYINSATURÉ STABLE VIS-À-VIS DE L'OXYDATION | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 17.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12787152.3 / EP2773216 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO03092628 (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORP [US], et al); | [X]US2007003686 (FICHTALI JAOUAD [US], et al); | [A]US2007141223 (MOORE JOSHUA J [US], et al); | [XI]GB2444896 (NUTRACEUTICALS LTD [GB]); | [A]US2010298274 (HUGHES ADRIAN [NL], et al) | by applicant | WO9107498 | US5130242 | WO9408467 | EP0776356 | US5928696 | WO0151598 | WO0153512 | WO0176715 | WO0176385 | US6399803 | WO03009628 | WO03105606 | US2005012739 | US2005170479 | US2007004678 | WO2011153246 |