EP3971872 - TAMPER EVIDENT SECURITY ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hueck Folien Gesellschaft m.b.H. Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIGNER, Georg 4482 Ennsdorf / AT | 02 /
RICKER, Waltraud 3321 Ardagger Markt / AT | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20197193.4 | 21.09.2020 | [2022/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3971872 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/00, // G09F3/02 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G09F3/0292 (EP);
G09F2003/0213 (EP);
G09F2003/0245 (EP);
G09F2003/0272 (EP);
G09F2003/0276 (EP);
G09F2003/0277 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT MIT MANIPULATIONSNACHWEIS | [2022/12] | English: | TAMPER EVIDENT SECURITY ELEMENT | [2022/12] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ COMPRENANT UN SCEAU D'INVIOLABILITÉ | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 21.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9602048 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1 * page 12, line 19 - page 15, line 18 * * figures 1-8 * [A] 2-23; | [X]US2006077287 (KOSHU WATARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 4-10B *; | [A]DE102009007548 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2019077996 (WANG CHUNG CHIN [TW]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1-4g * |