EP3778450 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATED INCUBATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gen-Probe Incorporated 10210 Genetic Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121-4362 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSE, David 4002 Kenosha Avenue San Diego, California 92117 / US | 02 /
COMBS, David, Howard 4041 Kenosha Avenue San Diego, California 92117 / US | 03 /
HAGEN, Norbert, D. 3033 Paseo Estribo Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | 04 /
OPALSKY, David 10552 Corte Jardin Del Mar San Diego, California 92130 / US | 05 /
RICHARDSON, Bruce 14801 Golf Links Drive Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | 06 /
PRASAD, Anita 15768 Kavin Lane Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | 07 /
MORAVICK, Keith 2579 Dell Avenue Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 08 /
MOORE, Tyler 700 Harrison Avenue Campbell, California 95008 / US | 09 /
KNIGHT, Byron, J. 4481 Palo Verde Terrace San Diego, CA California 92115 / US | [2021/11] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
BUSE, David 4002 Kenosha Avenue San Diego, California 92117 / US | ||
02 /
COMBS, David, Howard 4041 Kenosha Avenue San Diego, California 92117 / US | |||
03 /
HAGEN, Norbert, D. 3033 Paseo Estribo Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | |||
04 /
OPALSKY, David 10552 Corte Jardin Del Mar San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
05 /
RICHARDSON, Bruce 103 Cooper Court Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | |||
06 /
PRASAD, Anita 103 Cooper Court Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | |||
07 /
MORAVICK, Keith 2579 Dell Avenue Mountain View, California 94043 / US | |||
08 /
MOORE, Tyler 103 Cooper Court Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | |||
09 /
KNIGHT, Byron, J. 4481 Palo Verde Terrace San Diego, CA California 92115 / US | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 20197384.9 | 31.07.2013 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | US201261677976P | 31.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261677976 P | US201361783952P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361783952 P | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778450 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/00, C12Q1/68, B01L3/00 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
B01L7/52 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/686 (CN,US);
B01L9/06 (CN,US);
G01N21/6452 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2200/141 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2200/142 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/042 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/043 (EP);
B01L2300/0654 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/0851 (EP,CN,US);
B01L2300/1822 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN INKUBATION | [2021/07] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATED INCUBATION | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR INCUBATION AUTOMATISÉE | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 13.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13826240.7 / EP2879981 | EP19161987.3 / EP3564166 | Divisional application(s) | EP23214994.8 / EP4309790 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010136632 (LIPSCOMB JAMES H [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0030]; figures 1, 4, 5A-C *; | [A]US2011312102 (JO SUNG-HO [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0003]; figures 6,8,9 * | by applicant | US4683195 | US5130238 | WO9313121 | US5378825 | US5399491 | US5455166 | WO9532305 | US5539082 | US5585481 | US5641658 | US5849478 | US6083482 | US6130038 | US6268490 | US6410278 | US6431015 | US6670461 | US6824024 | US6869571 | US6949367 | US2005244303 | US7282328 | US7374885 | US7582470 | US2010179687 | - VESTER et al., Biochemistry, (20040000), vol. 43, no. 42, pages 13233 - 41 | - LIZARDI et al., BioTechnology, (19880000), vol. 6, page 1197 |