EP3816759 - APPARATUS COMPRISING MEANS FOR MEASURING THE HUMIDITY OF A GAS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING HUMIDITY WITHIN SUCH AN APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Sensor Innovation Limited 7 Haslingfield Road Harlton Cambridge CB23 1ER / GB | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williamson, Mark Edward 7 Haslingfield Road Harlton, cambridgeshire CB23 1ER / GB | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | Application number, filing date | 20198352.5 | 25.09.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | GB20190015605 | 28.10.2019 Original published format: GB 201915605 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816759 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05D22/02, A21B3/04, F24C15/32 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
A21B3/04 (EP);
G01P3/487 (US);
F24C15/003 (US);
F24C15/327 (EP);
G01K13/00 (US);
G01P3/36 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUCHTEMESSUNG | [2022/01] | English: | APPARATUS COMPRISING MEANS FOR MEASURING THE HUMIDITY OF A GAS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING HUMIDITY WITHIN SUCH AN APPARATUS | [2021/18] | French: | MESURE D'HUMIDITÉ | [2022/01] |
Former [2021/18] | GERÄT MIT MITTEL ZUR MESSUNG DER FEUCHTIGKEIT EINES GASES UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER FEUCHTIGKEIT IN EINEM SOLCHEN GERÄT | ||
Former [2021/18] | APPAREIL COMPRENANT DES MOYENS DE MESURE DE L'HUMIDITÉ D'UN GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE L'HUMIDITÉ DANS UN TEL APPAREIL | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 27.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003000284 (HORVATH JENO [DE], et al); | [X]US2003167823 (GRUHBAUM KLAUS [DE], et al); | [A]WO2018096369 (CAMBRIDGE SENSOR INNOVATION LTD [GB]) |