EP3974505 - CONCENTRATED FLOWABLE DETERGENT COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Job, Mareile 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Meier, Frank 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
Schimanski, Eva 41068 Mönchengladbach / DE | 04 /
Bergmann-Dalkilic, Simone 40629 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20198366.5 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974505 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3974505 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/72, C11D3/37, C11D3/43, C11D17/04, // C11D3/20 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
C11D17/043 (EP);
C11D1/72 (EP);
C11D3/3723 (EP);
C11D3/43 (EP);
C11D3/201 (EP);
C11D3/2044 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | KONZENTRIERTE FLIESSFÄHIGE WASCHMITTELZUBEREITUNG MIT VERBESSERTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2022/13] | English: | CONCENTRATED FLOWABLE DETERGENT COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED PROPERTIES | [2022/13] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE DÉTERGENT COULANTE CONCENTRÉE AYANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS AMÉLIORÉES | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2020 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 14.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [T]WO2006086492 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [T] * example 1 *; | [A]EP2014753 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * example - *; | [A]EP2924105 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0122] *; | [X]DE102014218953 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-10 * paragraphs [0116] - [0125]; table 2 *; | [A]EP3202878 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * example - *; | [XI]WO2017133879 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * page 1, line 21 - line 30; example - * [I] 7 | by applicant | DE3132219 | DE10027674 | - M. BENDER et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19660000), vol. 88, no. 24, pages 5890 - 5913 |