EP3800352 - PISTON FOR COMPRESSOR AND COMPRESSOR HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07336 SEOUL / KR | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kyunyoung LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
NOH, Kiwon LG Electronics Inc., IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/14] | Application number, filing date | 20198683.3 | 28.09.2020 | [2021/14] | Priority number, date | KR20190121522 | 01.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190121522 | [2021/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800352 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3800352 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00, F04B35/04, F16J1/00, F16J1/09 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
F04B39/0016 (EP,US);
F04B39/0005 (KR);
F04B35/045 (EP,US);
F04B39/10 (KR);
F04B39/1086 (US);
F16J1/005 (EP);
F16J1/09 (EP,KR);
F04B17/046 (US);
F04B53/14 (US);
F05B2210/14 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/14] | F04B39/00, F04B35/04, F16J1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2021/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOLBEN FÜR VERDICHTER SOWIE VERDICHTER DAMIT | [2021/14] | English: | PISTON FOR COMPRESSOR AND COMPRESSOR HAVING SAME | [2021/14] | French: | PISTON POUR COMPRESSEUR ET COMPRESSEUR EN ÉTANT DOTÉ | [2021/14] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 15.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21207540.2 / EP3985253 | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2020 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | ES | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | NL | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
NL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102005038605 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XAY]WO2009003260 (WHIRLPOOL SA [BR], et al); | [XAY]US2015377227 (MUHLE HENRIQUE BRUGGMANN [BR], et al); | [A]EP3346127 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [AD]KR101990140B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | by applicant | KR101990140B |