EP3797600 - METHOD FOR TEMPERING CONSUMABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNOBEL, Guido Ermatinger Strasse 17 8268 Salenstein / CH | [2021/52] |
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states KW Patente AG Suravia 74 7537 Müstair / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/04] |
Former [2021/13] | 01 /
KNOBEL, Guido 17, Ermatingerstrasse 8268 Salenstein / CH | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt Weiß, Arat & Partner mbB Zeppelinstraße 4 78234 Engen / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 20199132.0 | 30.09.2020 | [2021/13] | Priority number, date | DE201910126354 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019126354 | DE201910134989 | 18.12.2019 Original published format: DE102019134989 | [2021/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797600 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3797600 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/20, A23G7/02 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
A23G7/02 (EP);
A23G1/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TEMPERIEREN VON VERZEHRGUT | [2021/13] | English: | METHOD FOR TEMPERING CONSUMABLES | [2021/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN TEMPÉRATURE D'UN PRODUIT DE CONSOMMATION | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 30.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.2023 | 30.09.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE29904127U (KMB PRODUKTIONS AG [CH]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - line 28 * * page 4, line 15 - line 21 * [A] 2-8 [I] 10; | [A]US6318111 (MURAKAMI MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 15 *; | [XA]EP1757192 (AWEMA AG [CH]) [X] 1,8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * [A] 2-7; | [XAI]WO2019162341 (KW PATENTE AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - line 24 * * page 7, line 21 - line 26 * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 4 * [A] 3-7 [I] 10 |